skip to content

Frost, Peter Graham

CPSO#: 23327

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Washington Street
Markham ON  L3P 2R3
Phone: (905) 471-2337
Fax: (905) 471-2337 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 3E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

brooklin med centre
5959 anderson st
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Frost Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017
Corporation Name: P. Frost, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER GRAHAM FROST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1970