skip to content

Frombach, Aaron Andrew

CPSO#: 97752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Level 1 - Suite 100
65 Bayly St
Ajax ON  L1S 7K7
Phone: 905 426 2233
Fax: 905 426 3306 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Frombach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Frombach ( CPSO# 97752 )

Business Address:
601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 207
Ajax ON  L1S 3M1
Phone Number: (905) 686-0882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON ANDREW FROMBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROMBACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017