skip to content

From, Lynn

CPSO#: 19518

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CML Healthcare Inc. Histology Department 6560 Kennedy Road Mississauga, ON L5T 2X4; Women's College Hospital Division Of Dermatology 76 Grenville Street Toronto, ON M5S 1B2; Toronto Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Instructions: Medical records are located at Sunnybrook Hospital, Women's College Hospital and CML Healthcare Inc.
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014