skip to content

Fried, Ben-Ari

CPSO#: 84655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital , WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33554 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Eve and Ben-Ari Fried Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fried ( CPSO# 79058 )
Dr. B. Fried ( CPSO# 84655 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital-WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 850-0004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEN-ARI FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011