skip to content

Frey, Benicio Noronha

CPSO#: 88029

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jan 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens Health Concerns Clinic,
Department of Psychiatry and
Behavioural Neurosciences
100 West 5th Street, Room C124
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33605
Fax: 905-381-5629 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Frey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Frey ( CPSO# 88029 )

Business Address:
Women's Health Concern Clinic
Department of Psychiatry & Behavioural Neuroscienc
Room C124
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jan 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 16 Jan 2008 to 03 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2018 Active
             Dr. Benicio Noronha Frey may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.