skip to content

Freistatter, Ryan Lance

CPSO#: 88333

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
101 McIntyre St West
North Bay ON  P1B 2Y5
Phone: (705) 472-7577
Fax: (855) 440-1123 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.L. Freistatter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN LANCE FREISTATTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREISTATTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010