skip to content

Freeman, Laura Michele

CPSO#: 97397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Crookston Road
Glasgow
Glasgow G52 3NQ
United Kingdom
Phone: +441418103151

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA MICHELE FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015