skip to content

Freeman, Kenneth Carlton

CPSO#: 86888

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 King St W, Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1200 Markham Rd #425
SCARBOROUGH M1H 3C3
Canada
Phone: 4164387080
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. KC Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Freeman ( CPSO# 86888 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
2-500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-3444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH CARLTON FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012