skip to content

Freeman, Jeremy Louis

CPSO#: 30078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5141
Fax: 416 466 6580 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy L. Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY LOUIS FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978