skip to content

Freedman, Melvin Harris

CPSO#: 23506

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 2-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 602 - 55 Prince Arthur Ave Toronto ON M5R 1B3
Date Received: 15 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018