skip to content

Frecker, Helena Mary Alaine

CPSO#: 90785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 466-2360
Fax: (416) 466-5076 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Helena Frecker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Frecker ( CPSO# 90785 )

Business Address:
658 Danforth Avenue
Suite 311
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 466-2360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELENA MARY ALAINE FRECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014