skip to content

Fraser, Emily Joan

CPSO#: 93191

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Military Trail
Student Centre SL-270
Toronto ON  M1C 1A4
Phone: 416-287-7065
Fax: 416-287-7069 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Morant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fraser ( CPSO# 93191 )
Dr. K. Morant ( CPSO# 93668 )

Business Address:
350 Victoria Street
181 Kerr Hall West
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Phone Number: (416) 979-5070

Business Address:
Corcare
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744


Corporation Name: Emily J. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fraser ( CPSO# 93191 )

Business Address:
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Phone Number: (416) 979-5070

Business Address:
1265 Military Trail
Scarborough ON  M1C 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 287-7065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY JOAN FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012