skip to content

Fraser, Donald

CPSO#: 11505

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Apr-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996