skip to content

Fransky, Melissa Kathleen

CPSO#: 92955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bancroft Family Health Team
P O Box 578
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: (613) 332-0526 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa K Fransky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fransky ( CPSO# 92955 )

Business Address:
Bancroft Family Health Team
PO Box 578
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-1565

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA KATHLEEN FRANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012