Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2007
Summary:
On August 30, 3007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Franklin to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee directed Dr. Franklin appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the results of the proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 30, 2007
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 10 Apr 2003
Summary:
On April 10, 2003, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Franklin to be incapacitated and directed that his certificate of registration be subject to terms, conditions and limitations that required workplace monitoring and personal health monitoring.
On August 30, 2007 the Fitness to Practise Committee heard a motion to vary the order of April 10, 2003. The Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Franklin to be incapacitated, varied the prior order and ordered that he abide by the terms of an undertaking attached to the Order [of August 30, 2007], which includes a provision that Dr. Franklin practise only with other physicians, each of whom shall be acceptable to the College, and at least one of whom will act as a workplace monitor. Such workplace monitor will be on the premises whenever Dr. Franklin is practising. If he does not have a current workplace monitor that is acceptable to the College OR if that workplace monitor is not on the premises, Dr. Franklin will not practice.
On June 9, 2009, the Fitness to Practise Committee heard a motion to vary the order of August 30, 2007. The Fitness to Practise Committee varied the prior order and ordered that he abide by the terms of a revised undertaking attached to the order [of June 9, 2009], which included the same provisions for workplace monitoring as set out in the order dated August 30, 2007.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Apr 2003