skip to content

Francu, Corina Maria

CPSO#: 86991

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Universitatea Transilvania, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6 - 314 Central Park Drive
Ottawa ON  K2C 0R2
Phone: (613) 728-0608
Fax: (613) 728-4286 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Francu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Francu ( CPSO# 86991 )

Business Address:
6-314 Central Park Drive
Ottawa ON  K2C 0R2
Phone Number: (613) 728-0608

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CORINA MARIA FRANCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014