skip to content

Frackowiak, Damian

CPSO#: 95363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The North Oakville Medical Centre
Rheumatology Clinic
402-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 847-2211
Fax: (905) 847-2214 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Damian Frackowiak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Frackowiak ( CPSO# 95363 )

Business Address:
The North Oakville Medical Centre
Rheumatology Clinic
Suite 402
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 847-2211

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAMIAN FRACKOWIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRACKOWIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015