skip to content

Foxcroft, Paul Jeremy

CPSO#: 22318

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1983