skip to content

Fox, Sherida Penelope

CPSO#: 28721

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992