skip to content

Fox, Anthony David

CPSO#: 23475

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2012
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.