skip to content

Fowler, Peter John

CPSO#: 20745

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Feb 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2013