skip to content

Fowler, John Harvey

CPSO#: 17083

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1. Michael Garron Hospital 825 Coxwell Ave, East York, ON M4C 3E7 Phone: (416) 461-8272 2. Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Ave, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 Phone: (416) 480-6100 3. Bridgepoint Active Healthcare 1 Bridgepoint Dr, Toronto, ON M4M 2B5 Phone: (416) 461-8252 4. Providence Healthcare 3276 St Clair Ave E, Scarborough, ON M1L 1W1 Phone: (416) 285-3666
Date Received: 04 Jun 2018


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may leave a message for Dr. Fowler at: Tel: 416-483-5106 with their contact information and records request so that Dr. Fowler may contact them regarding their request
Date Received: 31 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018