skip to content

Fowler, Adam Mark

CPSO#: 100414

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lions Gate Hospital
231 15th St. E
Vancouver BC  V7L 2L7
Phone: 6049883131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM MARK FOWLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOWLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014