skip to content

Fouse, Mervyn Bruce

CPSO#: 22769

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1990