skip to content

Fotheringham, Mary Elizabeth

CPSO#: 91416

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Kellogg Lane
London ON  N5W 2T5
Canada
Phone: 5196430003
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.E. Fotheringham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fotheringham ( CPSO# 91416 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:15 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH FOTHERINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOTHERINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014