skip to content

Foster, Deborah Lynette

CPSO#: 89704

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
EL - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012