skip to content

Forward, Karen Elaine

CPSO#: 87026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main Street W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Forward Haverstock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forward ( CPSO# 87026 )
Dr. J. Haverstock ( CPSO# 90749 )

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical
310 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 813-2004

Business Address:
MUMC Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Suite 2N491
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN ELAINE FORWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011