skip to content

Fortinsky, Kyle Joshua

CPSO#: 97900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15 Gallie Court
Suite 306
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705)721-3344
Fax: 705-721-5522 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Fortinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fortinsky ( CPSO# 97900 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
301 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 334-4232

Business Address:
23/24 - 15 Gallie Court
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 334-4232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLE JOSHUA FORTINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016