Fortin, Christian David (CPSO#: 90497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
Room G178
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 2933
Fax: (416) 461-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Omega Medical Associates
255 Consumers Road, Suite 100
North York ON  M2J 1R4
Canada
Phone: 416-489-0711
Fax: 416-489-7009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fortin and Zurawska-Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fortin ( CPSO# 90497 )
Dr. U. Zurawska-Fortin ( CPSO# 88380 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B9
Phone Number: (416) 530-6235

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
Room G-178
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 304
2 Lansing Square
North York ON  M2J 4P8
Phone Number: (416) 489-0711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN DAVID FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014