skip to content

Forson, Thomas Eugene

CPSO#: 25509

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thomas Forson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Jeanette stated that Dr. Forson's former patients can call her at 343-370-7304 to request a copy of their medical records.
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019


Instructions: Patients shoulld contact Dr. Forson by telephone at: , to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 12 Oct 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018