skip to content

Formoso, Alfredo Feraren

CPSO#: 31142

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Formoso-de Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Merivale Medical Imaging 1370 Clyde Ave Ottawa, ON K2G 3H8
Instructions: Medical record location as per above.
Date Received: 06 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 2018