skip to content

Forkert, Lutz

CPSO#: 24326

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Forkert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 102 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 07 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2017