skip to content

Forghani, Naghmeh

CPSO#: 111230

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 16 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Divison of Neonatology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAGHMEH FORGHANI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FORGHANI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FORGHANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FORGHANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FORGHANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FORGHANI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FORGHANI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2023.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 15 Mar 2017
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023