skip to content

Forget, Robert

CPSO#: 23424

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Apr 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Apr 1989
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Building
214-1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 521-6356
Fax: (613) 521-6330 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Apr 1989
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 12 Jun 2019 Active
             (1 of 2)
            As from October 10, 1990, Dr. Robert Forget is prohibited from practising
            surgery in the Province of Ontario.

            (2 of 2)

            As from June 12, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Forget, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Forget to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                          DR. ROBERT FORGET 
                                            ("Dr. Forget")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Forget, certificate of registration number 23424, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 7215863, 99276 and 1100830 (the "Investigations")
                  into my orthopedic practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        a minimum of eight (8) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least two (2) months, for a total of four (4) visits. At each
                              visit during this initial period of supervision, in addition
                              to reviewing patient charts as outlined below in (v), the
                              Clinical Supervisor will directly observe my practice for one
                              half ( 1/2) day, which shall include observation of a minimum
                              of five (5) patients receiving intra-articular injections;
                        (iv)  After a minimum of two (2) months of supervision, if my
                              Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a
                              reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor
                              will meet with me once every month for an additional six (6)
                              months;
                        (v)   Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at the completion of
                              two (2) months of Clinical Supervision, then every three (3)
                              months for the remainder of the Clinical Supervision, or more
                              frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my
                              standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical
                        inspector dated April 10, 2018, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date. I, Dr. Forget, undertake that if a
                        person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its
                        provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of
                        same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                        similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and
                        ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto's Medical Record-Keeping course; 
                        (ii)  CMPA modules:
                              1.    Documentation: Charting Medical Records 
                              2.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record-Keeping
                        (iii) Review and prepare a written summary of literature related
                              to: 
                              1.    Morton's neuroma and metatarsalgia
                              2.    Intra-articular steroid injections
                              3.    Intra-articular injection of viscosupplements 
                        (iv)  Review and prepare a written summary of the following College
                              policies: 
                              1.    Medical Records;
                              2.    Consent to Treatment;  
                              3.    Uninsured Services; and
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it and/or receiving
                        such reports or certificates. I acknowledge that the College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months, or if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, and may include an interview with
                        me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Forget, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Forget, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the 
                  provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Forget was the subject of College investigations into his
                              orthopedic practice. As a result of the investigations:
                  
                              Dr. Forget will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 8
                              months. 
                  
                              Dr. Forget will engage in professional education including in
                              medical record-keeping, intra-articular injections and
                              consent to treatment.
                  
                              Dr. Forget's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Forget, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Forget, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Forget, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Forget, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Oct 1990
Summary:

 In October 1990, Dr. Forget pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Forget 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Forget was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register; 

2.	Dr. Forget was to complete the evaluation of his ability to practice medical 
 orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, as ordered by the Corporation professionnelle des 
 médicins du Québec; 

3.	Dr. Forget was to provide to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario written authorization to obtain from the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du 
 Québec particulars of the evaluation made of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a 
 manner safe to the public, all recommendations made respecting a program of improvement, and 
 copies of any reports prepared for the Corporation following such an evaluation.  It was further 
 ordered that, should Dr. Forget fail to meet these requirements by 1 February 1991, then his 
 licence to practice medicine in Ontario would be suspended for six months; and 

4.	A restriction 
 was to be placed on Dr. Forget's licence, permanently prohibiting him from practicing surgery in 
 the Province of Ontario.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Oct 1990

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Forget to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 12, 2019:

Dr. Forget was the subject of College investigations into his orthopedic practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Forget will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 8 months.

Dr. Forget will engage in professional education including in medical record-keeping, intra-articular injections and consent to treatment.

Dr. Forget’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 2, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)