skip to content

Forfar, Katie Ann

CPSO#: 89316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitewater Bromley CHC
20 Robertson Drive
Beachburg ON  K0J 1C0
Phone: (613) 582-3685
Fax: (613) 582-7095 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caressent Care Retirement and LTC
12 Wren Drive
Cobden ON  K0J 1K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 646-2109
Fax: (613) 646-2182
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Forfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forfar ( CPSO# 89316 )

Business Address:
12 Wren Drive
P O Box 430
Cobden ON  K0J 1K0
Phone Number: (613) 646-2109

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2812

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATIE ANN FORFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010