skip to content

Foreman, John Alexander

CPSO#: 13589

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 24-Dec-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998