skip to content

Ford-Jones, Elizabeth Lee

CPSO#: 29111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Pearson, Elizabeth Lee (used until: 17 Feb 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 29 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019