skip to content

Ford-Jones, Anthony Eric Andre

CPSO#: 28110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Apr 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Burlington Childrens Clinic
Suite 103
Units 10 to 14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 634-1311
Fax: (905) 634-7202 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Ford-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ford-Jones ( CPSO# 28110 )

Business Address:
Suite 103, Unit 10-14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ERIC ANDRE FORD-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD-JONES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981