skip to content

Ford, Victoria Alison

CPSO#: 94801

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 16 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 17 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012