skip to content

Ford, Jennifer Lyndsey

CPSO#: 88709

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Region Mental Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4801 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

5063 North Service Rd. Suite 200
Burlington ON  L7L 5H6
Canada
Phone: 289-339-1176
Fax: 905-632-4427
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44020
Fax: 905-527-3360
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Ford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ford ( CPSO# 88709 )

Business Address:
East Region Mental Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNDSEY FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 02 May 2011 to 01 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 02 May 2012 to 01 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 02 May 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014