skip to content

Ford, Jacqueline

CPSO#: 24427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 201 60 Hatt Street Dundas, ON L9H 7T6
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014