skip to content

Fong, Harmon

CPSO#: 95237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4618 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harmon Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fong ( CPSO# 95237 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4618

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARMON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2011 to 28 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012