Fong, Bryan (CPSO#: 99161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryan Fong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fong ( CPSO# 99161 )

Business Address:
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33 - Second Floor
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone Number: (905) 604-7889

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014