skip to content

Fonberg, Eric Michael

CPSO#: 29392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7270 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E. Fonberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fonberg ( CPSO# 29392 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7404


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL FONBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1977