skip to content

Folkerson, Catherine Colette

CPSO#: 96182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Family Medicine
201-770 Broadview
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Folkerson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Folkerson ( CPSO# 96182 )

Business Address:
Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-1065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE COLETTE FOLKERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLKERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013