skip to content

Folk, David Martin

CPSO#: 94118

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Health Care Unit
Box 4000
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone: (807) 737-5164
Fax: (807) 737-5089 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Folk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Folk ( CPSO# 94118 )

Business Address:
Primary Health Care Unit
Box 4000
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 737-5164


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID MARTIN FOLK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010