skip to content

Foley, Francis John

CPSO#: 32043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Oct 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
3455 Garrard Road
Whitby ON  L1R 2N2
Phone: (905) 432-7977
Fax: (905) 432-8793 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Foley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCIS JOHN FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1980