skip to content

Flowers, David John

CPSO#: 24918

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.J. Flowers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Ossama Fares Box 459 560 Albert Street Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016