skip to content

Florica, Brandusa

CPSO#: 85190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 502
130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Phone: (905) 848-2444
Fax: (905) 848-2447 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 16
585 Ontario Street
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 693-9500
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brandusa Florica Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Florica ( CPSO# 85190 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
West Toronto Site
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
St. George Medical Centre
16 - 585 Ontario Street
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 693-9500

Business Address:
502 - 130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 848-2444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDUSA FLORICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010