skip to content

Florendo-Cumbermack, Anita Gonsalvez

CPSO#: 91226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road Room
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3129
Fax: (519) 663-3328 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anita Florendo-Cumbermack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Florendo-Cumbermack ( CPSO# 91226 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3129

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANITA GONSALVEZ FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Neurology

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016